+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 9
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor