+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 19
- Effective Date
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper