+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 521
- Effective Date
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Receded from Amend or Sub
- Senate Sent to Governor
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- House Insisted
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2022: Senate Vote #575 RECEDE FROM SENATE'S DISAGREEMENT AND AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
February 24, 2022: Senate Vote #553 AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
February 24, 2022: Senate Vote #554 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
February 24, 2022: Senate Vote #555 DISAGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
March 31, 2021: House Vote #415 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 150
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 4
March 8, 2021: Senate Vote #162 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 54
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor