+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor