+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 183
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Postponed
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper