+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Tabled
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper