+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 17
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
March 31, 2021: Senate Vote #372 AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 5
March 29, 2021: House Vote #346 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 48
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 10
February 24, 2021: Senate Vote #68 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor