+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper