+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper