+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Third Read
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
- House Second Readers
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
- House Hopper