+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 803
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Engrossed
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Resolution By Substitute
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- House Reconsidered
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House Notice to Reconsider
- House Third Reading Lost
- House Third Readers
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (5)
April 1, 2022: Senate Vote #776 MOTION TO ENGROSS: HB 1421, HB 1291, HB 1437, HB 428, HB 923, HB 1039, HB 1058, HB 1280, HR 594, HR 732, HR 842
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 4
April 1, 2022: Senate Vote #814 ADOPTION OF CONSTITUTIONAL AMENDMENT
- Yeas: 55
- Absent: 1
March 11, 2022: House Vote #679 ADOPT
- Yeas: 150
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 25
March 4, 2022: House Vote #610 Reconsider
- Yeas: 147
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 14
March 3, 2022: House Vote #605 ADOPT
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 28