+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper