+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 42
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
- House Second Readers
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2021: Senate Vote #281 ADOPTION
- Yeas: 46
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 4
March 8, 2021: House Vote #192 ADOPT
- Yeas: 169
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 3