+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper