+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Hopper