+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- House Hopper