+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper