+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- House Hopper