+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor