+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
- House Second Readers
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper