+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 350
- House Date Signed by Governor
- House Sent to Governor
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Third Readers
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Hopper