+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Postponed
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper