+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 407
- House Date Signed by Governor
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
February 7, 2022: Senate Vote #473 LOCAL CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
January 27, 2022: House Vote #461 Local Calendar
- Yeas: 124
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 16