+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 1, 2014 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Act 387
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Hopper