+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Postponed
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor