+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Lost
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Postponed
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper