+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Veto V14
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Postponed
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper