+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Act 269
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Tabled
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
March 31, 2021: House Vote #366 Agree Sen Sub
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 59
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 5
March 29, 2021: Senate Vote #348 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
March 3, 2021: House Vote #150 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 67
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 9