+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 323
- House Date Signed by Governor
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
February 3, 2022: Senate Vote #471 LOCAL CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 46
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 2
January 26, 2022: House Vote #456 Local Calendar
- Yeas: 156
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 17
January 26, 2022: House Vote #457 Local Calendar
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 17
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor