+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 5, 2020 in the House:
- Veto V1
- House Date Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House Hopper