+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 396
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper