+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Hopper