+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 479
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
- House Second Readers
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Hopper