+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 16, 2020 in the House:
- Act 474
- House Date Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On June 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House Hopper