+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
- House Date Signed by Governor
- Act 284
- Effective Date
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Engrossed
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Transmitted House
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Recommitted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper