+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Veto V13
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Postponed
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor