+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 310
- House Date Signed by Governor
- House Sent to Governor
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Engrossed
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (4)
February 14, 2022: House Vote #518 Agree to Senate Substitute
- Yeas: 122
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 19
February 14, 2022: Senate Vote #508 MOTION TO ENGROSS
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 14, 2022: Senate Vote #509 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2022: House Vote #473 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 137
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 11