+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Act 597
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Hopper