+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 6, 2014 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 356
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House Hopper