+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Report Adopted
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed 50th, 7th, 13th
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed 155th, 178th, 117th
- House Insisted
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Insisted
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Hopper