+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 1, 2014 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Act 542
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Tabled
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Hopper