+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Veto V12
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper