+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2017 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Act 47
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper