+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- House Date Signed by Governor
- Act 384
- Effective Date
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Resolution
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Reconsidered
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
- House Third Readers
- House Third Reading Lost
- House Notice to Reconsider
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper