+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 168
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper