+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Act 296
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Engrossed
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Hopper