+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 837
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2022: Senate Vote #709 LOCAL CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 55
- Absent: 1
March 11, 2022: House Vote #682 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 134
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 33