+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 1, 2014 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Act 514
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House Hopper