+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Act 451
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted As Amended
- House Third Readers
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Postponed
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Hopper