+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House Hopper